Irsee 1983 batch
WebJan 5, 2024 · New Delhi: Shri Vinay Kumar Tripathi takes over the charge of the new Chairman & CEO of the Railway Board. He is a 1983 batch officer of the Indian Railway … WebJun 8, 2024 · The railways has said 1983- and 1984-batch officers of its eight organised services are eligible to apply for Level-16 posts under the Indian Railway Management …
Irsee 1983 batch
Did you know?
WebMay 14, 2024 · A maximum of nine officers from Indian Railway Services of Mechanical Engineers (IRSME) cadre and only one from Indian Railway Stores Service (IRSS) are expected for empanelment. The list includes 18 officers from 1983 batch and 08 … WebShri Ashok Kumar Gupta, is an IRSEE -1983 batch officer, who retired from the post of Chief Electrical Engineer/Design from Indian Railways, Govt. of India. He did his B.Sc. Engineering (Elect.) from Aligarh Muslim University in the year 1981. He has held very important positions during his service in Indian Railways, likeChairman Railway ...
WebMember users can logon to their respective applications through this portal. ♦ WebIRSEE Seniority List Uploaded by Satish Kumar Chilamkurthy Copyright: Attribution Non-Commercial (BY-NC) Available Formats Download as PDF, TXT or read online from Scribd Flag for inappropriate content Download now of 19 SENIORTIY LIST OF ELECTRICAL DEPTT. INDIAN RAILWAY S. No. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 25 …
WebAug 5, 2024 · Unless otherwise stated, officers appointed to the Indian Railway Services (Group ‘A’) on the basis of competition examination held by the Union Public Service Commission (UPSC) w.e.f. 1986 2006 Examination batch and Special Class Railway Apprentices (SCRAs) w.e.f. 1983 2003 batch, shall count service for seniority from the … http://railministry.com/irse-1983-upsc-batch-complete-details/
WebTranslate Irsee. See 22 authoritative translations of Irsee in English with example sentences, conjugations and audio pronunciations.
WebThe Indian Civil Service ( ICS ), officially known as the Imperial Civil Service, was the higher civil service of the British Empire in India during British rule in the period between 1858 and 1947 . Its members ruled over more than 300 million people [1] in the Presidencies and provinces of British India and were ultimately responsible for ... promo food itemsWeb(IRSEE) 1983 batch have been empanelled for appointment to the posts of Joint Secretary or equivalent at the Centre at initial consideration:- S.N0. 6. Name of the Officers (Smt./Shri) … laboratory sectorhttp://railministry.com/irsee-1983-batch-details/ laboratory secondary schoolWeb9 rows · Jan 1, 2024 · IRSE 1983 Batch Details Indian Railway Service of Engineers is a prestigious Group ‘A’ Service ... promo foodspringWebNov 3, 2011 · s. no. name: date of birth: zone: dits: recruitment method: batch: grade: posted at: designation: telephone no. mobile: 1 : joshi archana: 05-10-1963 : nr: 22-12-1986 ... promo flyersWebJul 21, 2024 · Vinayak Garg IRSEE CVO. Shri Vinayak Garg IRSEE (1995), has been appointed as Commissioner, Navodaya Vidyalaya Samiti, Department of School Education & Literacy, from the date of assumption of the charge of the post, for a combined tenure of seven years upto 11.09.2024 vice Shri Biswajit Kumar Singh IFoS (JK 1989).. Indian Bureaucracy Dot … laboratory securityWebDec 23, 2024 · Paradip ( Odisha) : Vinit Kumar, the chairman of Syama Prasad Mookerjee Port (erstwhile Kolkata Port Trust) assumed the additional charge of chairman of Paradip Port Trust (PPT) on Wednesday. Vinit Kumar, an IRSEE officer of 1993 batch is at the helm of affairs of Syama Prasad Mookerjee Port, since 9 th October 2024. promo foodpanda october